EP1047331 - A VACUUM CLEANER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been limited Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyson Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2009/14] |
Former [2002/28] | For all designated states Dyson Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | ||
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states NOTETRY LIMITED Kingsmead Mill Little Somerford, Wiltshire SN15 5JN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DYSON, James Kingsmead Mill Little Somerford, Wiltshire SN15 5JN / GB | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Willows, Ben Ellis, et al Dyson Automotive Research and Development Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Smith, Gillian Ruth, et al Dyson Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | ||
Former [2001/21] | Smith, Gillian Ruth, et al Dyson Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | ||
Former [2000/44] | Smith, Gillian Ruth, et al Dyson Research Limited, PO Box 2080 Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0SW / GB | Application number, filing date | 98961318.7 | 17.12.1998 | [2000/44] | WO1998GB03816 | Priority number, date | GB19970026676 | 17.12.1997 Original published format: GB 9726676 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9930602 | Date: | 24.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1047331 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1047331 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | B3 Limited patent | No.: | EP1047331 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/16 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
A47L9/127 (EP,KR,US);
A47L5/28 (EP,KR,US);
A47L5/32 (EP,US);
A47L9/0009 (KR);
A47L9/0081 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/44] | Title | German: | STAUBSAUGER | [2000/44] | English: | A VACUUM CLEANER | [2000/44] | French: | ASPIRATEUR | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 30.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 22.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01120850.1 / EP1177757 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Limitations: | 19.11.2008 | Date of receipt of request for limitation | admissible | 29.01.2009 | Communication of intention to limit the patent | 14.02.2009 | Fee for printing patent specification after limitation | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.09.2002 | BE | 04.09.2002 | CH | 04.09.2002 | FI | 04.09.2002 | GR | 04.09.2002 | LI | 04.09.2002 | DK | 04.12.2002 | PT | 13.12.2002 | LU | 17.12.2002 | CY | 31.12.2002 | [2007/18] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
BE | 04.09.2002 | ||
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
FI | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
LU | 17.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
BE | 04.09.2002 | ||
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
FI | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
CY | 31.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
BE | 04.09.2002 | ||
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
FI | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 04.09.2002 | |
CH | 04.09.2002 | ||
FI | 04.09.2002 | ||
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
LI | 04.09.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | FI | 04.09.2002 | |
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
PT | 13.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | FI | 04.09.2002 | |
GR | 04.09.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 04.09.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE8607553U (VORWERK & CO INTERHOLDING GMBH) [A] 8* page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 2 *; | [A]GB2167680 (ENVIRO VAC LIMITED) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0245224 (PULLMAN AB [SE]) [A] 1,12,13 * page 6, line 30 - page 7, line 34 *; | [A]US5230722 (YONKERS ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1,12 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 4; figures 1-8 *; | [A]DE9317809U (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE]) [A] 8 * page 7, line 4 - page 9, line 22; figure 2 * |