EP0971374 - ULTRALOW-IRON-LOSS GRAIN ORIENTED SILICON STEEL PLATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/37] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2000/02] | For all designated states Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1-28 Kitahonmachidori 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOKUCHI, Y, Kawasaki Steel Corp. Tec. Res.Lab. 1, Kawasaki-cho, Chuo-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 260-08835 / JP | [2000/02] | Representative(s) | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | Stebbing, Timothy Charles Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98961483.9 | 22.12.1998 | [2000/02] | WO1998JP05817 | Priority number, date | JP19970354490 | 24.12.1997 Original published format: JP 35449097 | JP19980043238 | 25.02.1998 Original published format: JP 4323898 | JP19980074274 | 23.03.1998 Original published format: JP 7427498 | JP19980074275 | 23.03.1998 Original published format: JP 7427598 | [2000/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9934377 | Date: | 08.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0971374 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0971374 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/18, C21D8/12, H01F1/147 | [2003/26] | CPC: |
H01F1/14783 (EP,US);
H01F1/18 (KR);
C21D8/1277 (EP,US);
C21D8/1288 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24355 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24975 (EP,US);
Y10T428/26 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/02] | H01F1/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/02] | Title | German: | KORNORIENTIERTES SILIZIUMSTAHLBLECH MIT SEHR GERINGEM EISENVERLUST UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DESSELBEN | [2000/02] | English: | ULTRALOW-IRON-LOSS GRAIN ORIENTED SILICON STEEL PLATE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2000/02] | French: | PLAQUE D'ACIER AU SILICIUM A GRAINS ORIENTES A TRES FAIBLE PERTE DITE DANS LE FER ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE LADITE PLAQUE | [2000/02] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.1999 | Translation filed | 13.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.1999 | Search fee paid | 13.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 30.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0347975 ; | [A]JPH04165082 ; | [A]EP0215134 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]EP0260927 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO [JP]) [A] 1,3,7 * page 15, line 17 - line 28; example 9 *; | [A]EP0406833 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3,6,7 * claim 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910517), vol. 015, no. 193, Database accession no. (C - 0832), & JP03047975 A 19910228 (KAWASAKI STEEL CORP) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920928), vol. 016, no. 466, Database accession no. (C - 0989), & JP04165082 A 19920610 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPS53144419 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [Y]JPS6263408 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [Y]JPS63278209 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [X]JPH08222423 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO); | [Y]JPH09316655 (TOYO BOSEKI) |