EP0963821 - DIE CUT ROLL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TUNGSTEN CO., LTD. 2-8, Minoshima 1-chome Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8538 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | For all designated states NIPPON TUNGSTEN CO., LTD. 2-8, Minoshima 1-chome, Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8538 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAHARA, Kenji 2-8, Minoshima 1-chome, Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8538 / JP | 02 /
IBUSUKI, Koichi 2-8, Minoshima 1-chome, Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8538 / JP | 03 /
EGUCHI, Shouji 2-8, Minoshima 1-chome, Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8538 / JP | 04 /
KITAHARA, Kohei 2-8, Minoshima 1-chome, Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8538 / JP | 05 /
TOKUMOTO, Kei 2-8, Minoshima 1-chome, Hakata-ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8538 / JP | 06 /
SAKAGUCHI, Shigeya 2-8, Minoshima 1-chome, Hakata--ku Fukuoka-shi, Fukuoka 812-8538 / JP | [1999/50] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/50] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98961575.2 | 24.12.1998 | [1999/50] | WO1998JP05931 | Priority number, date | JP19970359215 | 26.12.1997 Original published format: JP 35921597 | JP19970359217 | 26.12.1997 Original published format: JP 35921797 | JP19970359235 | 26.12.1997 Original published format: JP 35923597 | [1999/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9933621 | Date: | 08.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0963821 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0963821 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B26F1/44, B26F1/38, B26D7/20 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
B26D1/0006 (EP,US);
B26F1/0015 (EP,US);
B26F1/384 (EP,US);
B26F1/44 (EP,US);
B26D2001/0053 (EP,US);
B26F2001/4409 (EP,US);
B26F2001/4436 (EP,US);
B26F2001/4472 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4838 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9372 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/50] | B26F1/44, B26F1/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1999/50] | Title | German: | ROTATIONSSTANZWERKZEUG | [1999/50] | English: | DIE CUT ROLL | [1999/50] | French: | CYLINDRE DE DECOUPAGE A LA FORME | [1999/50] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.1999 | Translation filed | 17.08.1999 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.1999 | Search fee paid | 17.08.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.1999 | Examination requested [1999/50] | 29.05.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 29.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02028763.7 / EP1297931 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03246000 ; | [X]US1044931 (SIMMONS PAUL RAYMOND [US]) [X] 19,20 * page 1, line 95 - line 100; figure - *; | [A]US2361288 (HARDY JR GEORGE E) [A] 6 * page 1, line 30 - line 33 *; | [Y]US3147656 (KWITEK EDWIN M) [Y] 11,13 * column 2, line 23 - line 64 *; | [X]GB1231848 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS) [X] 19 * page 2, line 70 - line 100; figure - *; | [A]US3677111 (DRAGOO SHERMAN L) [A] 1 * column 1, line 9 - line 10 * * column 1, line 16 * * column 1, line 30 - line 33 *; | [A]US3832926 (LEASEBURGE G, et al); | [A]DE2743258 (AIGUISAGE SERVICE S A) [A] 5,7,9 * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 1 *; | [Y]US4269093 (NICKUM ROBERT H) [Y] 11-13 * column 9, line 30 - line 43 *; | [A]US4289055 (VON SCHRILTZ DON F); | [A]US4653373 (GERBER HEINZ J [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 61 - line 65; figure 6 *; | [A]DE3927106 (SCHOBER WERKZEUG & MASCHBAU [DE]) [A] 1,6 * column 7, line 25 - line 45; figure - *; | [Y]EP0472097 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [Y] 11-13 * column 1, line 25 - column 2, line 30 *; | [X]GB2252743 (LANFOR LIMITED [IE]) [X] 19,20 * page 3, line 10 - line 14; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0608152 (MAGNAFLEX SYSTEMS LIMITED [GB]) [X] 18 * column 5, line 47 - line 52; figure 1D *; | [X]US5373758 (GERHARDT JOERGEN [DK]) [X] 19 * column 5, line 9 - line 11; figure 8 *; | [DY]JPH07227798 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [DY] 11,12 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] *; | [X]JPH0871999 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 3-10 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] *; | [Y]FR2726501 (SOCAR [FR]) [Y] 14-17,20 * page 2, line 15 - line 18 *; | [X]JPH09174497 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 18,20 * paragraph [0028] *; | [DXY]JPH09267299 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [DX] 3-10 * paragraph [0010] * [Y] 14-17,20 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920129), vol. 016, no. 036, Database accession no. (M - 1205), & JP03246000 A 19911101 (NIPPON TUNGSTEN CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH03246000 (NIPPON TUNGSTEN); | [X]JPH0788050B ; | [X]JPH0871999 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [Y]JPH09267299 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [X]JPH09300298 (TAMURA KOKI KK) | by applicant | JPH07227798 | JPH0871999 | JPH0872000 | JP2593570B | JPH09267299 |