EP1048329 - BREEDING SIMULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bandai Co., Ltd. 5-4, Komagata 2-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo 111-8081 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states Bandai Co., Ltd. 5-4, Komagata 2-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo 111-8081 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKADA, Hiroshi 5-4, Komagata 2-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo 111-8081 / JP | 02 /
KONDO, Takao 5-4, Komagata 2-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo 111-8081 / JP | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98961636.2 | 28.12.1998 | [2000/44] | WO1998JP05996 | Priority number, date | JP19970367784 | 26.12.1997 Original published format: JP 36778497 | [2000/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9933534 | Date: | 08.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1048329 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/22, G09B9/00, G06N3/00 | [2004/35] | CPC: |
G06N3/006 (EP,US);
A63F13/825 (EP,US);
A63F13/335 (EP);
A63F13/45 (EP);
A63F13/58 (EP);
A63F13/822 (EP);
A63F13/92 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G09B23/281 (EP,US);
A63F2300/204 (EP,US);
A63F2300/407 (EP);
A63F2300/63 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/44] | A63F9/22, G09B9/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/44] | Title | German: | BRUTSIMULATOR | [2000/44] | English: | BREEDING SIMULATOR | [2000/44] | French: | SIMULATEUR D'INCUBATION | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2000 | Translation filed | 24.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 24.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 24.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 04.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/18] | 23.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2001 | 31.12.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2004 | 31.12.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2005 | 31.12.2006 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE29710637U (BANDAI CO [JP]) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 25 - page 7, line 19 * * page 15, line 12 - page 18, line 5 *; | [A] - TAYLOR D, "Three ways to get A-life", IEEE EXPERT (USA), IEEE EXPERT, JULY-AUG. 1997, IEEE, USA, (199708), vol. 12, no. 4, ISSN 0885-9000, pages 25 - 30, XP002284341 [A] 1-6 * page 25, column L, line 12 - line 29 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/64.608180 | [A] - JARRATT S, "LOVE EGGS", T3, BATH, GB, (19970601), vol. 8, ISSN 1364-2642, page 83, XP002048354 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPH0343561U ; | [Y]JPH09152999 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) |