EP1038010 - GRAM-POSITIVE MICROORGANISM FORMATE TRANSPORTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, California 94304-1013 / US | [2000/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Brian 1446 Floribunda Avenue 3 Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | 02 /
DIAZ-TORRES, Maria 142 Johnson Avenue Los Gatos, CA 95030 / US | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98961758.4 | 19.11.1998 | [2000/39] | WO1998US24873 | Priority number, date | GB19970024627 | 20.11.1997 Original published format: GB 9724627 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9927107 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1038010 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1038010 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/67, C12N15/75, C12N9/00, C12N9/10, C12N9/80, C12N15/52, C12N15/31, C12N1/21, C12R1/07 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
C12Y305/01031 (EP,US);
C07K14/32 (EP,US);
C12N15/75 (EP,US);
C12N9/80 (EP,US);
C12Y305/0101 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/39] | Title | German: | FORMIAT TRANSPORTER AUS GRAM-POSITIVEn MIKROORGANISMEN | [2005/25] | English: | GRAM-POSITIVE MICROORGANISM FORMATE TRANSPORTERS | [2000/39] | French: | CHEMIN DU FORMIATE DANS DES MICRO-ORGANISMES GRAM-POSITIFS | [2000/39] |
Former [2000/39] | FORMIAT TRANSPORTER AUS GRAM-POSITIVE MIKROORGANISMEN | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE NOVOZYMES A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Miles, John Stephen Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.10.2006
ADMISSIBLE NOVOZYMES A/S Krogshoejvej 36 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK Opponent's representative Miles, John Stephen Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | 23.11.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.04.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.05.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.01.2006 | BE | 18.01.2006 | CH | 18.01.2006 | IT | 18.01.2006 | LI | 18.01.2006 | SE | 18.04.2006 | ES | 29.04.2006 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
BE | 18.01.2006 | ||
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SE | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 18.01.2006 | |
CH | 18.01.2006 | ||
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 18.01.2006 | |
LI | 18.01.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 29.04.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0299108 (RHEIN BIOTECH GES FUR BIOTECHN [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,7,10 * abstract * * page 2, lines 30-54 * * page 5 - page 9 *; | [A]EP0805208 (KIRIN BREWERY [JP]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 24 * * page 10, line 49 - page 11, line 55 *; | [PX]WO9803664 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [PX] 22-24 * see page 18-19; page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 17; examples 1-5 *; | [PX]WO9807867 (BIOTEKNOLOGISK INST [DK], et al) [PX] 1,10,11,25,30,31* page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 12; example 4 *; | [X] - DATABASE EMBL NUCLEOTIDE AND PROTEIN SEQUENCES, HINXTON, GB, XP002105615 [X] 10 * abstract * | [PX] - DATABASE EMBL NUCLEOTIDE AND PROTEIN SEQUENCES, HINXTON, GB, XP002105629 [PX] 10 * abstract * | [X] - A. SOROKIN ET AL.,, "Sequence of the Bacillus subtilis genome region in the vicinity of the lev operon reveals two new extracytoplasmic function RNA polymerase sigma factors SigV and sigZ", MICROBIOLOGY, (199709), vol. 143, no. 9, pages 2939 - 2943, XP002105616 [X] 10 * see Table 1 (page 2940) and Fig 1. * | [A] - J. NÖLLING AND J.R. REEVE, "Growth- and substrate-dependent transcription of the formate dehydrogenase (fdhCAB) operon in Methanobacterium thermoformicicum Z-245", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (199702), vol. 179, no. 3, pages 899 - 908, XP002105617 [A] 10 * see discussion. * | [DA] - B. SUPPMANN AND G. SAWERS, "Isolation and characterization of hypophosphite-resistant mutants of Escherichia coli: Identification of the FocA protein, encoded by the pfl operon, as a putative formate transporter", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, (1994), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 965 - 982, XP002105618 [DA] 1,10,11 * pages 965-966; figures 3,9,11 * * see discussion * | [X] - DATABASE EMBL NUCLEOTIDE AND PROTEIN SEQUENCES, HINXTON, GB, XP002105619 [X] 11 * abstract * | [X] - P. GLASER ET AL.,, "Bacillus subtilis genome project: cloning and sequencing of the 97 kb region from 325° to 333°", MOLECULAR MIROBIOLOGY, (1993), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 371 - 384, XP002105620 [X] 11 * page 378, column R, paragraph 6 * | [X] - M. DEBARBOUILLE ET AL.,, "The sacT gene regulating the sacPA operon in Bacillus subtilis shares strong homology with transcriptional antiterminators", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1990), vol. 172, no. 7, pages 3966 - 3973, XP002105621 [X] 11 * see discussion.; page 3966; figure 2 * | [X] - DATABASE EMBL NUCLEOTIDE AND PROTEIN SEQUENCES, HINXTON, GB, XP002105622 [X] 12 * abstract * | [PX] - DATABASE EMBL NUCLEOTIDE AND PROTEIN SEQUENCES, HINXTON, GB, XP002105630 [PX] 12 * abstract * | [AD] - P.L. NAGY ET AL.,, "Formyltetrahydrofolate hydrolase, a regulatory enzyme that functions to balance pools of tetrahydrofolate and one-carbon tetrahydrofolate adducts in Escherichia coli", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1995), vol. 177, no. 5, pages 1292 - 1298, XP002105623 [AD] 12 * page 1292 * * se discussion. * | [DA] - H.H. SAXILD ET AL.,, "Genetic and physiological characterization of a formate-dependent 5'-phosphoribosyl-1-glycinamide transformylase activity in Bacillus subtilis", MOLECULAR AND GENERAL GENETIC, (1994), vol. 242, pages 415 - 420, XP002105624 [DA] 12 * page 415 * * page 419 - page 420 * | [X] - DATABASE EMBL NUCLEOTIDE AND PROTEIN SEQUENCES, HINXTON, GB, XP002105625 [X] 22,23,30,31 * abstract * | [X] - D. MAZEL ET AL.,, "A survey of polypeptide deformylase function throughout the eubacterial lineage", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 266, no. 5, pages 939 - 949, XP002105626 [X] 22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1996.0835 | [DA] - MAZEL D ET AL, "GENETIC CHARACTERIZATION OF POLYPEPTIDE DEFORMYLASE, A DISTINCTIVE ENZYME OF EUBACTERIAL TRANSLATION", EMBO JOURNAL, (19940215), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 914 - 923, XP002043973 [DA] 22 * see the whole document and specially Figure 3. * | [A] - WARREN W C ET AL, "Increased production of peptide deformylase eliminates retention of formylmethionine in bovine somatotropin overproduced in Escherichia coli", GENE, (19960101), vol. 174, no. 2, page 235-238, XP004043268 [A] 22,23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(96)00086-8 |