EP1037654 - ribA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.02.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALMER, Leslie, M. 2820 Eagleville Road Audubon, PA 19407 / US | 02 /
FEDON, Jason, C. Apartment 2, 106 Fairfield Lane Strafford, PA 19087 / US | 03 /
WARREN, Richard, L. 426 East Triple Crown Way Grantsville, UT 84029 / US | 04 /
REICHARD, Raymond, W. 4937 Remington Drive Coopersburg, PA 18036 / US | 05 /
WARD, Judith, M. Carmele Cottage, 19 Cotmandene Dorking, Surrey / GB | 06 /
WANG, Min 302 Centennial Drive Blue Bell, PA 19422 / US | 07 /
BLACK, Michael, T. 47 Boulevard d'Angleterre 78110 Le Vesinet / FR | 08 /
HODGSON, John, E. 260 Lapp Road Malvern, PA 19355 / US | 09 /
NICHOLAS, Richard, O. 355 Carmen Drive Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 10 /
MOONEY, Jeffrey 143 Winged Foot Court Limerick, PA 19469 / US | 11 /
DEBOUCK, Christine 667 Pugh Road Wayne, PA 19087 / US | 12 /
ZHONG, Yiyi 1011 Bayberry Lane Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 13 /
KNOWLES, David, J., C. Ladywell House, York Road Boroughbridge, North Yorkshire / GB | 14 /
LONETTO, Michael, A. 18 Victoria Circle Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 15 /
ROSENBERG, Martin 241 Mingo Road Royersford, PA 19468 / US | 16 /
JAWORSKI, Deborah, D. 947 N. Walnut Street West Chester, PA 19380 / US | 17 /
PRATT, Julie, M. Via Alessandro Fleming, 2 I-37155 Verona / IT | 18 /
BURNHAM, Martin, K., R. 565 Forgedale Road Barto, PA 18432 / US | 19 /
TRAINI, Christopher, M. 50 Potter Court Media, PA 19063 / US | [2000/49] |
Former [2000/47] | 01 /
PALMER, Leslie, M. 2820 Eagleville Road Audubon, PA 19407 / US | ||
02 /
FEDON, Jason, C. Apartment 2, 106 Fairfield Lane Strafford, PA 19087 / US | |||
03 /
WARREN, Richard, L. 426 East Triple Crown Way Grantsville, UT 84029 / US | |||
04 /
REICHARD, Raymond, W. 2091 Clover Mill Road Quakertown, PA 18951 / US | |||
05 /
WARD, Judith, M. Carmele Cottage, 19 Cotmandene Dorking, Surrey / GB | |||
06 /
WANG, Min 302 Centennial Drive Blue Bell, PA 19422 / US | |||
07 /
BLACK, Michael, T. 502 Milhouse Way Chester Springs, PA 19425 / US | |||
08 /
HODGSON, John, E. 260 Lapp Road Malvern, PA 19355 / US | |||
09 /
NICHOLAS, Richard, O. 355 Carmen Drive Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | |||
10 /
MOONEY, Jeffrey 143 Winged Foot Court Limerick, PA 19469 / US | |||
11 /
DEBOUCK, Christine 667 Pugh Road Wayne, PA 19087 / US | |||
12 /
ZHONG, Yiyi 1011 Bayberry Lane Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | |||
13 /
KNOWLES, David, J., C. Ladywell House, York Road Boroughbridge, North Yorkshire / GB | |||
14 /
LONETTO, Michael, A. 18 Victoria Circle Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | |||
15 /
ROSENBERG, Martin 241 Mingo Road Royersford, PA 19468 / US | |||
16 /
JAWORSKI, Deborah, D. 214 Willowbrook Drive Norristown, PA 19403 / US | |||
17 /
PRATT, Julie, M. Via Alessandro Fleming, 2 I-37155 Verona / IT | |||
18 /
BURNHAM, Martin, K., R. 565 Forgedale Road Barto, PA 18432 / US | |||
19 /
TRAINI, Christopher, M. 50 Potter Court Media, PA 19063 / US | |||
Former [2000/39] | 01 /
PALMER, Leslie, M. 2820 Eagleville Road Audubon, PA 19407 / US | ||
02 /
FEDON, Jason, C. Apartment 2, 106 Fairfield Lane Strafford, PA 19087 / US | |||
03 /
WARREN, Richard, L. 825 Cathcart Road Blue Bell, PA 19422 / US | |||
04 /
REICHARD, Raymond, W. 2091 Clover Mill Road Quakertown, PA 18951 / US | |||
05 /
WARD, Judith, M. Carmele Cottage, 19 Cotmandene Dorking, Surrey / GB | |||
06 /
WANG, Min 302 Centennial Drive Blue Bell, PA 19422 / US | |||
07 /
BLACK, Michael, T. 502 Milhouse Way Chester Springs, PA 19425 / US | |||
08 /
HODGSON, John, E. 260 Lapp Road Malvern, PA 19355 / US | |||
09 /
NICHOLAS, Richard, O. 355 Carmen Drive Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | |||
10 /
MOONEY, Jeffrey 143 Winged Foot Court Limerick, PA 19469 / US | |||
11 /
DEBOUCK, Christine 667 Pugh Road Wayne, PA 19087 / US | |||
12 /
ZHONG, Yiyi Apartment D305, 2828 Egypt Road Audubon, PA 19403 / US | |||
13 /
KNOWLES, David, J., C. Ladywell House, York Road Boroughbridge, North Yorkshire / GB | |||
14 /
LONETTO, Michael, A. 18 Victoria Circle Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | |||
15 /
ROSENBERG, Martin 241 Mingo Road Royersford, PA 19468 / US | |||
16 /
JAWORSKI, Deborah, D. 214 Willowbrook Drive Norristown, PA 19403 / US | |||
17 /
PRATT, Julie, M. Via Alessandro Fleming, 2 I-37155 Verona / IT | |||
18 /
BURNHAM, Martin, K., R. 565 Forgedale Road Barto, PA 18432 / US | |||
19 /
TRAINI, Christopher, M. 50 Potter Court Media, PA 19063 / US | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98961768.3 | 24.11.1998 | [2000/39] | WO1998US25068 | Priority number, date | US19970977554 | 25.11.1997 Original published format: US 977554 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9926646 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1037654 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, A61K39/00, A61K39/395, C07H21/04, C07K14/31, C12N9/00, C12N15/31, C12N15/63, G01N33/53 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
C12Y305/04025 (EP,US);
C12N9/78 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/39] | Title | German: | RIBA | [2000/39] | English: | ribA | [2000/39] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES "ribA" | [2000/39] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2000 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 07.02.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - FULLER T E, MULKS M H, "CHARACTERIZATION OF ACTINOBACILLUS PLEUROPNEUMONIAE RIBOFLAVIN BIOSYNTHESIS GENES", Journal of Bacteriology, American Society for Microbiology, US, US, (19951201), vol. 177, no. 24, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 7265 - 7270, XP002917743 |