EP1034249 - PROCESS FOR MAKING A DETERGENT TABLET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/37] | DETERGENT TABLET | ||
[2003/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | ||
Former [2000/37] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAINTER, Jeffrey, Donald 11652 Enyart Road Loveland, OH 45140 / US | [2000/37] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/37] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited, Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98961774.1 | 24.11.1998 | [2000/37] | WO1998US25075 | Priority number, date | US19970066964P | 26.11.1997 Original published format: US 66964 P | [2000/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9927068 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1034249 | Date: | 13.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1034249 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/00 | [2000/37] | CPC: |
C11D17/0078 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WASCHMITTELTABLETTE | [2003/44] | English: | PROCESS FOR MAKING A DETERGENT TABLET | [2003/44] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE PASTILLE DE DETERGENT | [2003/44] |
Former [2000/37] | WASCHMITTELTABLETTE | ||
Former [2000/37] | DETERGENT TABLET | ||
Former [2000/37] | PASTILLE DE DETERGENT | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 25.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2004 | BE | 15.09.2004 | CH | 15.09.2004 | CY | 15.09.2004 | FI | 15.09.2004 | LI | 15.09.2004 | IE | 24.11.2004 | LU | 24.11.2004 | DK | 15.12.2004 | GR | 15.12.2004 | PT | 15.02.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
CY | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
LU | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
IE | 24.11.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
DK | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
BE | 15.09.2004 | ||
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
CH | 15.09.2004 | ||
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
LI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
GR | 15.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 15.09.2004 | |
FI | 15.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 15.09.2004 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0224135 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [DA] 1,6-9 * page 9, line 33 - line 44; example .; claim -; table - *; | [A]EP0481547 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-3,6-9 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0481793 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1* claim - *; | [E]GB2327949 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [E] 1-9 * the whole document * |