EP1050163 - CATV PASSIVE COMPONENT WITH RF SPLITTER AND POWER ADDING/REMOVAL PORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION 101 Tournament Drive Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states General Instrument Corporation 101 Tournament Drive Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRESKO, Richard 1417 County Line Road Huntingdon Valley, PA 19006 / US | [2000/45] | Representative(s) | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Cooper, John, et al Murgitroyd & Company, Chartered Patent Agents, 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | ||
Former [2000/45] | Boydell, John Christopher, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98962038.0 | 10.12.1998 | [2000/45] | WO1998US26177 | Priority number, date | US19980005649 | 12.01.1998 Original published format: US 5649 | [2000/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9935838 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050163 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1050163 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/10, H03H7/46 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
H04N7/104 (EP,US);
H04N7/10 (KR);
H03H7/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/45] | Title | German: | PASSIVES KABELFERNSEHBAUELEMENT MIT HF-VERTEILER UND ANSCHLUSSBUCHSE ZUR HINZUFÜGUNG UND WEGNAHME VON LEISTUNG | [2000/45] | English: | CATV PASSIVE COMPONENT WITH RF SPLITTER AND POWER ADDING/REMOVAL PORT | [2000/45] | French: | COMPOSANT PASSIF DE TV CABLEE AVEC SEPARATEUR DE FREQUENCE RADIO ET PORT D'ADJONCTION/RETRAIT DE PUISSANCE | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 08.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2004/23] | DE | 08.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3671885 (PENNYPACKER FRANK C) [A] 1,10 * column 5, line 65 - column 9, line 55; figures 5-13 *; | [A]WO9732438 (ERICSSON RAYNET [US]) [A] 1,10 * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 19 * * page 9, line 1 - page 10, line 34; figures 3,4 *; | [A]WO9747082 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9610853 (ROSE WALTER GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1,10 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 24; figure 1 * |