Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1050163
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.04.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
16.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] |
12.03.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] |
21.03.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] |
11.01.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.12.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
30.03.2001 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] |
09.03.2001 |
First examination report |
|
05.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.09.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.11.2000 [2000/45] |
22.09.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.11.2000 [2000/45] |
15.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.01.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|