Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU750840B | Global Dossier | 01.08.2002 | B2 | AU1720899 | 26.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US564998 | 12.01.1998 | US9826177 | 10.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1050163 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2003 | B1 | EP1050163 | 08.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US564998 | 12.01.1998 | US9826177 | 10.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9813895 | 10.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US564998 | 12.01.1998 | US9826177 | 10.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2317514 | 09.12.2003 | C | CA2317514 | 15.07.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US564998 | 12.01.1998 | US9826177 | 10.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69814469T | 11.03.2004 | T2 | DE69814469D1 | 12.06.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US564998 | 12.01.1998 | US9826177 | 10.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9935838 | Global Dossier | 15.07.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US564998 | 12.01.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100384372B | Global Dossier | 22.05.2003 | B1 | KR20010033627 | 25.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US564998 | 12.01.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW382181B | 11.02.2000 | B | Priority number | Date | US564998 | 12.01.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5959507 | 28.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US564998 | 12.01.1998 |