EP1032696 - VECTOR FOR TISSUE-SPECIFIC REPLICATION AND GENE EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cell Genesys Inc. 500 Forbes Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2004/15] |
Former [2003/11] | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1230 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2003/10] | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis Pharma GmbH Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Vienna / AT | |||
Former [2001/32] | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | |||
Former [2000/36] | For:BE
CH
CY
DE
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
Novartis AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | ||
For:AT
Novartis-Erfindungen Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Yung-Nien 11 Watkins Glen Court Cockeysville, MD 21030 / US | 02 /
HALLENBECK, Paul, L. 7461 Rosewood Manor Lane Gaithersburg, MD 20882 / US | 03 /
HAY, Carl, M. 28301 Honeysuckle Drive Damascus, MD 20872 / US | 04 /
STEWART, David, A. 6023 Kennard Court Eldersburg, MD 21784 / US | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2003/20] | Grubb, Philip William, et al Novartis AG, Corporate Intellectual Property, Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2000/36] | Becker, Konrad, et al Novartis AG Corporate Intellectual Property Patent- und Markenabteilung 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 98962352.5 | 17.11.1998 | [2000/36] | WO1998EP07380 | Priority number, date | US19970974391 | 19.11.1997 Original published format: US 974391 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9925860 | Date: | 27.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1032696 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1032696 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86, C12N7/01, C12N5/10 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C12N2710/10343 (EP,US);
C12N2830/008 (EP,US);
C12N2830/15 (EP,US);
C12N2830/30 (EP,US);
C12N2830/32 (EP,US);
C12N2830/85 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/36] | Title | German: | VEKTOR ZUR GEWEBESPEZIFISCHEN REPLIKATION UND EXPRESSION | [2000/36] | English: | VECTOR FOR TISSUE-SPECIFIC REPLICATION AND GENE EXPRESSION | [2000/36] | French: | VECTEUR POUR REPLICATION ET EXPRESSION GENIQUE A SPECIFICITE TISSULAIRE | [2000/36] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 05.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2006 | CY | 14.06.2006 | FI | 14.06.2006 | IT | 14.06.2006 | NL | 14.06.2006 | DK | 14.09.2006 | SE | 14.09.2006 | GR | 15.09.2006 | ES | 25.09.2006 | PT | 14.11.2006 | IE | 17.11.2006 | LU | 17.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
IE | 17.11.2006 | ||
LU | 17.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
IE | 17.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
IE | 17.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/18] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
ES | 25.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 14.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9505835 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9614875 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9617053 (GENETIC THERAPY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9634969 (CANJI INC [US]) [X] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9636365 (GENETIC THERAPY INC [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9701358 (CALYDON [US]) [X] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9835028 (BAXTER INT [US]) [PX] 1-35 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9839465 (CALYDON INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9839466 (CALYDON INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9839467 (CALYDON INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-37 * the whole document *; | [X] - HALLENBECK, P. L. ET AL, "Novel tumor specific replication competent adenoviral vectors for gene therapy of cancer.", CANCER GENE THERAPY, (1996) VOL. 3, NO. 6 CONF. SUPPL., PP. S19-S20. MEETING INFO.: FIFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON GENE THERAPY OF CANCER SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA NOVEMBER 14-16, 1996 ISSN: 0929-1903., XP002099752 [X] 1-37 * abstract * | [PX] - HALLENBECK, P. L. ET AL, "Novel tumor specific replication restricted adenoviral vector for gene therapy of liver cancer.", CANCER GENE THERAPY, (NOV.-DEC., 1997) VOL. 4, NO. 6 CONF. SUPPL., PP. S22. MEETING INFO.: SIXTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON GENE THERAPY OF CANCER SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA NOVEMBER 20-22, 1997 ISSN: 0929-1903., XP002099753 [PX] 1-37 * abstract * |