Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1041907
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.10.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
21.11.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 07.01.2004 [2004/02] |
31.07.2003 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.01.2003 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
09.01.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.06.2001 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] |
30.03.2001 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.05.2001 [2001/20] |
27.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.09.2000 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
25.08.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] |
25.08.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.10.2000 [2000/41] |
02.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|