EP1064228 - APPARATUS FOR ELECTROCOAGULATIVE TREATMENT OF INDUSTRIAL WASTE WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/01] | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTROCOAGULATIVE TREATMENT OF INDUSTRIAL WASTE WATER | ||
[2005/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaspar Electroplating Corporation P.O. Box 667 Shiner, TX 77984 / US | [2005/48] |
Former [2001/01] | For all designated states Kaspar Electroplating Corporation P.O. Box 667 Shiner, TX 77984 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORKOVSKY, Paul, E. 1702 N. Avenue B Shiner, TX 77984 / US | 02 /
KASPAR, Douglas, D. FM 533 Shiner, TX 77984 / US | 03 /
PETRU, Jonathan, M. 1720 N. Avenue E Shiner, TX 77984 / US | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Loven, Keith James Loven Patents & Trademarks West Central Runcorn Road Lincoln LN6 3QP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Loven, Keith James Loven & Co Quantum House 30 Tentercroft Street Lincoln LN5 7DB / GB | Application number, filing date | 98962821.9 | 23.11.1998 | [2001/01] | WO1998US24885 | Priority number, date | US19970976695 | 24.11.1997 Original published format: US 976695 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9926887 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1064228 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1064228 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.06.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/461, C02F1/463, C02F1/465 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
B01D21/0003 (EP,US);
B01D17/06 (EP,US);
B01D21/0009 (EP,US);
B01D21/0045 (EP,US);
B01D21/01 (EP,US);
B01D21/02 (EP,US);
B01D21/08 (EP,US);
B01D21/2405 (EP,US);
B01D21/2416 (EP,US);
B01D21/2427 (EP,US);
B01D21/245 (EP,US);
B01D21/2466 (EP,US);
B01D21/2483 (EP,US);
C02F1/463 (EP,US);
C02F1/5281 (EP,US);
C02F1/56 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON INDUSTRIELLEN ABWÄSSERN DURCH ELEKTROKOAGULATION | [2005/12] | English: | APPARATUS FOR ELECTROCOAGULATIVE TREATMENT OF INDUSTRIAL WASTE WATER | [2005/12] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT PAR ELECTROCOAGULATION D'EAUX RESIDUAIRES INDUSTRIELLES | [2005/12] |
Former [2001/01] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON INDUSTRIELLEN ABWÄSSERN DURCH ELEKTROKOAGULATION | ||
Former [2001/01] | PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR ELECTROCOAGULATIVE TREATMENT OF INDUSTRIAL WASTE WATER | ||
Former [2001/01] | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT PAR ELECTROCOAGULATION D'EAUX RESIDUAIRES INDUSTRIELLES ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.05.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 26.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.11.2005 | BE | 30.11.2005 | CH | 30.11.2005 | CY | 30.11.2005 | FI | 30.11.2005 | FR | 30.11.2005 | IT | 30.11.2005 | LI | 30.11.2005 | NL | 30.11.2005 | DK | 28.02.2006 | GR | 28.02.2006 | SE | 28.02.2006 | DE | 01.03.2006 | ES | 13.03.2006 | PT | 02.05.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/16] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
IT | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
DE | 01.03.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
ES | 13.03.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
PT | 02.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
GR | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
BE | 30.11.2005 | ||
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | AT | 30.11.2005 | |
CH | 30.11.2005 | ||
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
DK | 28.02.2006 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/33] | CH | 30.11.2005 | |
FI | 30.11.2005 | ||
LI | 30.11.2005 | ||
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | ||
SE | 28.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/24] | FI | 30.11.2005 | |
NL | 30.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9113029 (MURRELL WILFRED ANTHONY [AU]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]FR2707282 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0794157 (LEE MING SHING [TW]) [A] 1,3,8,15 * figures 3,7; claims 1,2,13,16 * | International search | [A]US3766037 (KI LEE S); | [A]US4272369 (LOVE LEONARD S) |