EP1051542 - LOW DENSITY HIGH SURFACE AREA COPPER POWDER AND ELECTRODEPOSITION PROCESS FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ElectroCopper Products Limited Suite 288, 1255 West Baseline Road Mesa, AZ 85202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | For all designated states Electrocopper Products Limited Suite 288, 1255 West Baseline Road Mesa, AZ 85202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOHUT, Stephen, J. 1622 Los Altos Court Chandler, AZ 85224 / US | 02 /
HAINES, Ronald, K. 6699 N. Weatherby Drive Mentor, OH 44060 / US | 03 /
SOPCHAK, Nicholas, D. 4 North Curtis Road Wynantskill, NY 12198 / US | 04 /
GORT, Wendy 11830 North Joi Drive Tucson, AZ 85737 / US | [2000/46] | Representative(s) | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Nachshen, Neil Jacob, et al D Young & Co 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98963260.9 | 18.12.1998 | [2000/46] | WO1998US26943 | Priority number, date | US19980018269 | 04.02.1998 Original published format: US 18269 | [2000/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9940240 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1051542 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C25C5/02 | [2000/46] | CPC: |
C25C5/02 (EP,KR,US);
B22F1/06 (EP,KR,US);
C22C1/0425 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/46] | Title | German: | KUPFER PULVER MIT NIEDRIGER DICHTE UND HOHER SPEZIFISCHER OBERFLÄCHE UND ELEKTROLYTISCHES VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2000/46] | English: | LOW DENSITY HIGH SURFACE AREA COPPER POWDER AND ELECTRODEPOSITION PROCESS FOR MAKING SAME | [2000/46] | French: | POUDRE DE CUIVRE DE FAIBLE DENSITE A GRANDE AIRE DE SURFACE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION PAR DEPOT ELECTROLYTIQUE | [2000/46] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 24.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/07] | 10.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH02218762 ; | [A]JPH01247584 ; | [X]FR2001454 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO) [X] 1 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]WO9714825 (ELECTROCOPPER PROD LTD [US]) [A] 23* see whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 41, Database accession no. 90-309100, XP002096785 & JPH02218762 A 19900831 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO) [X] 1,2,7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 89, no. 45, Database accession no. 89-330257, XP002096786 & JPH01247584 A 19891003 (NIPPON MINING CO) [A] 15 * abstract * |