Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1051542
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.12.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
06.09.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
22.03.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.12.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.05.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.11.2000 |
First examination report |
|
21.11.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.09.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] |
29.09.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] |
14.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.08.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.08.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.02.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|