Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010040546 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US9826943 | 18.12.1998 | US1826998 | 04.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002502915 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9826943 | 18.12.1998 | US1826998 | 04.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU745105B | Global Dossier | 14.03.2002 | B2 | AU1831799 | 23.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9826943 | 18.12.1998 | US1826998 | 04.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1051542 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9826943 | 18.12.1998 | US1826998 | 04.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9815092 | 17.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9826943 | 18.12.1998 | US1826998 | 04.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2317573 | 12.08.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9826943 | 18.12.1998 | US1826998 | 04.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6322609 | 27.11.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US38409399 | 27.08.1999 | US1826998 | 04.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9940240 | Global Dossier | 12.08.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1826998 | 04.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR019521 | 27.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1826998 | 04.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1284139 | 14.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US1826998 | 04.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ID22363A | 07.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US1826998 | 04.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20000168 | 24.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1826998 | 04.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW473560B | 21.01.2002 | B | Priority number | Date | US1826998 | 04.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6036839 | 14.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US1826998 | 04.02.1998 |