EP1037881 - PROCESS OF PREPARING SUBSTITUTED PYRIMIDINONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMGEN INC. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURGESS, Laurence, E. 5617 Slick Rock Court Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 02 /
KOCH, Kevin 7227 Four Rivers Road Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Richardson, Kate, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | Richardson, Kate, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Franz-Joseph Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98963791.3 | 04.12.1998 | [2000/39] | WO1998US25790 | Priority number, date | US19970067513P | 04.12.1997 Original published format: US 67513 P | US19980204569 | 03.12.1998 Original published format: US 204569 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928303 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1037881 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1037881 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/56, C07D401/04 | [2000/39] | CPC: |
C07D239/56 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP);
C07D405/04 (EP);
C07D409/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/39] | Extension states | AL | 05.06.2000 | LT | 05.06.2000 | LV | 05.06.2000 | MK | 05.06.2000 | RO | 05.06.2000 | SI | 05.06.2000 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SUBSTITUIERTEN PYRIMIDINONEN | [2000/39] | English: | PROCESS OF PREPARING SUBSTITUTED PYRIMIDINONES | [2000/39] | French: | PROCEDE SERVANT A PREPARER DES PYRIMIDINONES SUBSTITUEES | [2000/39] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 09.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5100897 (ALLEN ERIC E [US], et al) [DA] 1-16* see Schemes 7 to 11, examples, claims *; | [DY]US5518994 (KAWAMURA YASUO [JP], et al) [DY] 1-16 * column 14, line 55 - column 17, line 40; claim - *; | [Y] - T. HIYAMA ET. AL., "A new synthesis of 3-amino-2-alkenoates", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (198204), vol. 23, no. 15, pages 1597 - 1600, XP002100269 [Y] 1-16 * see whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(00)87168-3 |