blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1038350

EP1038350 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING ELECTRONIC AUDIO SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
True Dimensional Sound, Inc.
1450 Madruga Avenue, Suite 404 Coral Gables
Florida 33146 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
True Dimensional Sound, Inc.
1450 Madruga Avenue, Suite 404
Coral Gables, Florida 33146 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GARCIA, Arturo, J.
25323 S.W. 127 Place
Miami, FL 33146 / US
02 / GARCIA, Arturo, H.
4443 S.W. 11th Street
Miami, FL 33134 / US
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel, et al
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel, et al
David Keltie Associates, 12 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1AG / GB
Application number, filing date98963879.611.12.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998US26430
Priority number, dateUS1997098937312.12.1997         Original published format: US 989373
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9930414
Date:17.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1038350
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2001
ClassificationIPC:H03G3/00, G10H1/12
[2001/14]
CPC:
G10H1/12 (EP,KR); H01F19/02 (KR); H03G5/02 (KR);
H04R3/04 (KR); G10H2240/251 (EP,KR)
Former IPC [2000/39]H03G3/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/39]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG VON AUDIOSIGNALEN[2000/39]
English:APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR ENHANCING ELECTRONIC AUDIO SIGNALS[2000/39]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER DES SIGNAUX AUDIO ELECTRONIQUES[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase14.06.2000National basic fee paid 
14.06.2000Search fee paid 
14.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
14.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
01.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/02]
04.08.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200104   M06   Fee paid on   18.04.2002
31.12.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]  - LANGFORD-SMITH F, "RADIOTRON DESIGNER'S HANDBOOK", RADIOTRON DESIGNER'S HANDBOOK, XX, XX, XX, (19530101), pages 206 - 211, XP002917537
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.