blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0970522

EP0970522 - BGA CONNECTOR WITH HEAT ACTIVATED CONNECTION AND DISCONNECTION MEANS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.11.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.01.2002  [2002/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court Lisle
Illinois 60532-1682 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court
Lisle Illinois 60532-1682 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NODA, Atsuhito
7-1-901, Miniamiosawa 5-chome
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / OKANO, Masato
103 Groundmaison Aoyama, 1-1-0-15 Hiramachida
Machida City, Tokyo Metropolis / JP
03 / FUJII, Hiroyuki
103 Tsukasa, 10-11 Futamatagawa, 1-chome, Asahi-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Evans, Huw David Duncan
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Churchill House
Churchill Way
Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Evans, Huw David Duncan
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road
Cardiff CF2 1AA / GB
Application number, filing date98964132.918.12.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998US27066
Priority number, dateJP1997036512519.12.1997         Original published format: JP 36512597
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9933109
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970522
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.07.1999
ClassificationIPC:H01L23/498, H05K3/34
[2000/02]
CPC:
H05K1/0212 (EP); H01L23/49827 (EP); H05K3/3436 (EP);
G01R1/07307 (EP); G01R31/2886 (EP); H01L2224/16 (EP);
H01L2924/01078 (EP); H01L2924/15311 (EP); H01L2924/3011 (EP);
H05K1/141 (EP); H05K1/167 (EP); H05K2201/049 (EP);
H05K2201/09263 (EP); H05K2201/0949 (EP); H05K2201/09772 (EP);
H05K2201/10378 (EP); H05K2203/1115 (EP); H05K2203/162 (EP);
H05K3/3494 (EP); Y02P70/50 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/02]
TitleGerman:BGA-VERBINDER MIT WÄRMEAKTIVIERTEN MITTELN ZUM VERBINDEN UND LÖSEN[2000/02]
English:BGA CONNECTOR WITH HEAT ACTIVATED CONNECTION AND DISCONNECTION MEANS[2000/02]
French:CONNECTEUR BGA MUNI DE MOYENS DE CONNEXION ET DE DECONNEXION ACTIVES A CHAUD[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase20.10.1999National basic fee paid 
20.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
03.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/02]
09.08.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/02]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.10.1999DE   M01   Fee paid on   20.10.1999
20.10.1999FR   M01   Fee paid on   20.10.1999
20.10.1999GB   M01   Fee paid on   20.10.1999
20.10.1999IT   M01   Fee paid on   20.10.1999
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5615824  (FJELSTAD JOSEPH [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * column 4, line 56 - column 7, line 54; figure 3 *;
 [Y]US4813128  (MASSOPUST DAN [US]) [Y] 1-20 * column 3, line 28 - column 6, line 28; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5093987  (SCHOLZ JAMES P [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 10, line 9 - column 13, line 37; figures 11,15 *;
 [A]US5691041  (FRANKENY RICHARD FRANCIS [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 22 - column 6, line 53; figure 5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.