Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010033878 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US309798 | 06.01.1998 | US9827605 | 23.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4301731B | Global Dossier | 22.07.2009 | B2 | JP2002501240 | 15.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US309798 | 06.01.1998 | US9827605 | 23.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014599 | Global Dossier | 26.07.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US309798 | 06.01.1998 | US9827605 | 23.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1046257 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2005 | B1 | EP1046257 | 25.10.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US309798 | 06.01.1998 | US9827605 | 23.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE290280T | 15.03.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US309798 | 06.01.1998 | US9827605 | 23.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69829218T | 16.02.2006 | T2 | DE69829218D1 | 07.04.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US309798 | 06.01.1998 | US9827605 | 23.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9935787 | Global Dossier | 16.09.1999 | A3 | WO9935787 | 15.07.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US309798 | 06.01.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6349352 | 19.02.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US309798 | 06.01.1998 |