EP1046257 - A HOME AUDIO/VIDEO NETWORK WITH DEVICE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SE | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SONY ELECTRONICS, INC. Sony Drive Park Ridge New Jersey 07656 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states SONY ELECTRONICS INC. Sony Drive Park Ridge, New Jersey 07656 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEA, Rodger, J. 210 & 1/2 16th Street San Jose, CA 95113 / US | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98964930.6 | 23.12.1998 | [2000/43] | WO1998US27605 | Priority number, date | US19980003097 | 06.01.1998 Original published format: US 3097 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9935787 | Date: | 15.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1046257 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1046257 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L29/06 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
H04L12/281 (EP,US);
H04L12/00 (KR);
H04L12/2803 (EP,US);
H04L12/2805 (EP,US);
H04L12/40117 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04N7/24 (EP,US);
H04L69/24 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99931 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | EIN AUDIO-VIDEO-HAUSNETZWERK MIT GERÄTSTEUEREUNG | [2000/43] | English: | A HOME AUDIO/VIDEO NETWORK WITH DEVICE CONTROL | [2000/43] | French: | RESEAU AUDIO/VIDEO DOMESTIQUE AVEC COMMANDE D'APPAREIL | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 18.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.03.2005 | BE | 02.03.2005 | CH | 02.03.2005 | FI | 02.03.2005 | FR | 02.03.2005 | IT | 02.03.2005 | LI | 02.03.2005 | NL | 02.03.2005 | DK | 02.06.2005 | GR | 02.06.2005 | SE | 02.06.2005 | ES | 13.06.2005 | PT | 17.08.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/31] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
FR | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
NL | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
GR | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
PT | 17.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
CH | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
LI | 02.03.2005 | ||
DK | 02.06.2005 | ||
ES | 13.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 02.03.2005 | |
BE | 02.03.2005 | ||
FI | 02.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 02.03.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A] - CHILD J, "INTELLIGENT HOME TECHNOLOGY LOOKS FOR LEVERAGE FROM RELATED MARKETS", COMPUTER DESIGN, (19971201), vol. 36, no. 12, pages 85 - 87, XP000754856 [A] 1,22 * page 87, column M, line 30 - column R, line 34 * | [A] - EVANS G, "CEBus. Defining the future of residential communications", AUSTRALIAN ELECTRONICS ENGINEERING, MARCH 1997, REED BUSINESS PUBLISHING, AUSTRALIA, ISSN 0004-9042, vol. 30, no. 3, pages 34 - 36, 38, XP002105591 [A] 1,22 * page 36, column L, line 10 - column M, line 7 * * page 38, column L, lines 4-10 * | [A] - MARKWATER B ET AL, "Design techniques for plug-and-play in "smart homes" and consumer products", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, 18 AUG. 1997, PENTON PUBLISHING, USA, ISSN 0013-4872, vol. 45, no. 17, pages 64 - 66, 68, XP002105592 [A] 1,22 * page 65, column L, line 19 - column R, line 44 * |