EP1058703 - A METHOD FOR INCREASING THE MOLECULAR WEIGHT OF POLYESTER RESINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINISTERO DELL' UNIVERSITA' E DELLA RICERCA SCIENTIFICA E TECNOLOGICA (M.U.R.S.T.) Piazza J.F. Kennedy, 20 00144 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | For all designated states MINISTERO DELL' UNIVERSITA' E DELLA RICERCA SCIENTIFICA E TECNOLOGICA Piazza Kennedy 20 00144 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEREGO, Gabriele Via Voghera, 20 I-20144 Milano / IT | 02 /
BASTIOLI, Catia Via della Noce, 63 I-28100 Novara / IT | 03 /
CELLA, Gian, Domenico Via Minghetti, 1 I-28100 Novara / IT | 04 /
GARDANO, Andrea Corso Roma, 11 I-13039 Trino (Vercelli) / IT | [2003/41] |
Former [2000/50] | 01 /
PEREGO, Gabriele Via Voghera, 20 I-20144 Milano / IT | ||
02 /
BASTIOLI, Catia Via della Noce, 63 I-28100 Novara / IT | |||
03 /
CELLA, Gian, Domenico Via Minghetti, 1 I-28100 Novara / IT | |||
04 /
GARDANO, Andrea Corso Roma, 11 I-13039 Trino / IT | Representative(s) | Rambelli, Paolo Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/50] | Rambelli, Paolo c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 98965185.6 | 27.11.1998 | [2000/50] | WO1998EP07624 | Priority number, date | IT1997TO01042 | 01.12.1997 Original published format: IT TO971042 | IT1997TO01044 | 01.12.1997 Original published format: IT TO971044 | [2000/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928367 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1058703 | Date: | 13.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1058703 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/80, C08G63/91, C08G63/20 | [2000/50] | CPC: |
C08G18/4216 (EP,US);
C08G18/4238 (EP,US);
C08G18/4277 (EP,US);
C08G63/912 (EP,US);
C08G63/916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/50] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES MOLEKULARGEWICHTS VON POLYESTERHARZEN | [2000/50] | English: | A METHOD FOR INCREASING THE MOLECULAR WEIGHT OF POLYESTER RESINS | [2000/50] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'ACCROITRE LE POIDS MOLECULAIRE DE RESINES DE POLYESTER | [2000/50] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 02.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.10.2003 | BE | 15.10.2003 | CH | 15.10.2003 | FI | 15.10.2003 | LI | 15.10.2003 | NL | 15.10.2003 | CY | 27.11.2003 | IE | 27.11.2003 | LU | 27.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | DK | 15.01.2004 | GR | 15.01.2004 | SE | 15.01.2004 | ES | 26.01.2004 | PT | 15.03.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2005/23] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
BE | 15.10.2003 | ||
CH | 15.10.2003 | ||
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
LI | 15.10.2003 | ||
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
IE | 27.11.2003 | ||
LU | 27.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
ES | 26.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
BE | 15.10.2003 | ||
CH | 15.10.2003 | ||
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
LI | 15.10.2003 | ||
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
IE | 27.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
ES | 26.01.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
BE | 15.10.2003 | ||
CH | 15.10.2003 | ||
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
LI | 15.10.2003 | ||
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
ES | 26.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
BE | 15.10.2003 | ||
CH | 15.10.2003 | ||
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
LI | 15.10.2003 | ||
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
ES | 26.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
CH | 15.10.2003 | ||
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
LI | 15.10.2003 | ||
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
ES | 26.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
CH | 15.10.2003 | ||
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
LI | 15.10.2003 | ||
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
DK | 15.01.2004 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
CH | 15.10.2003 | ||
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
LI | 15.10.2003 | ||
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
CY | 27.11.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
CH | 15.10.2003 | ||
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
LI | 15.10.2003 | ||
NL | 15.10.2003 | ||
GR | 15.01.2004 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 15.10.2003 | |
FI | 15.10.2003 | ||
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 15.10.2003 | |
SE | 15.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 15.01.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3853821 (SID AHMED A, et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 2, line 13 - column 2, line 25 * * tables I,II * * claims 1,2,4 *; | [Y]WO9308226 (M & G RICERCHE SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-12 * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 2 * * table 1 * * claims 1,2,12 *; | [A]WO9426820 (M & G RICERCHE SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-3 *; | [X]WO9611978 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 18, line 17 - page 19, line 16 * * claims 1,2,6,14 *; | [A]WO9730105 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1,3,21 *; | [A] - S. FAKIROW, "Wiederverwertung thermoplastischer Polykondensat-Abfälle", KUNSTSTOFFE, (1984), vol. 74, pages 218 - 221, XP002099678 [A] 1-12 |