EP1045769 - AIR INLET FOR A HEATING OR AIR CONDITIONING INSTALLATION IN AN MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLAUDRAFF, Ernst Paul-Gerhardt-Allee 25a D-81245 München / DE | [2000/43] | Application number, filing date | 98965227.6 | 03.12.1998 | [2000/43] | WO1998EP07869 | Priority number, date | DE1997156346 | 18.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19756346 | [2000/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9932310 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1045769 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1045769 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/28 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
B60H1/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/43] | Title | German: | LUFTEINTRITT FÜR EINE HEIZUNGS- ODER KLIMAANLAGE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES | [2000/43] | English: | AIR INLET FOR A HEATING OR AIR CONDITIONING INSTALLATION IN AN MOTOR VEHICLE | [2000/43] | French: | ENTREE D'AIR POUR L'INSTALLATION DE CHAUFFAGE OU DE CLIMATISATION D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 19.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB922894 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1 * page 2, line 17 - page 2, line 32; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0301494 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 3 * column 6, line 18 - column 6, line 46; figures 1-7 * * column 11, line 19 - column 14, line 16; figures 8-18 * [A] ; | [A]FR1398105 (RENAULT) [A] 4 * page 3, column 1, paragraph 3; figure 10 *; | [DA]FR1165665 (RENAULT) [DA] * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 * |