EP1042280 - PRODRUGS OF ASPARTYL PROTEASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VERTEX PHARMACEUTICALS INCORPORATED 130 Waverly Street Cambridge, MA 02139-4242 / US | [2000/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALE, Michael, R. 42 Sunset Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 02 /
TUNG, Roger, D. 14 Thoreau Circle Beverly, MA 01915 / US | 03 /
BAKER, Christopher, T. Apt. 5, 23 Judith Lane Waltham, MA 02154 / US | 04 /
SPALTENSTEIN, Andrew 4105 Brewster Drive Raleigh, NC 27606 / US | 05 /
FURFINE, Eric, Steven 4133 Livingstone Place Durham, NC 27707 / US | 06 /
KALDOR, Istvan 7 Bonham Court Durham, NC 27703 / US | 07 /
KAZMIERSKI, Wieslaw, Mieczyslaw 1221 Stone Creek Way Raleigh, NC 27615 / US | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/41] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98965466.0 | 23.12.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998US27424 | Priority number, date | US19970068889P | 24.12.1997 Original published format: US 68889 P | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9933793 | Date: | 08.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1042280 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07C311/00 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/34 (EP,US);
A61K31/4172 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/66 (EP,US);
A61K31/7024 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C311/18 (EP,US);
C07D307/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Extension states | AL | 11.07.2000 | LT | 11.07.2000 | LV | 11.07.2000 | MK | 11.07.2000 | RO | 11.07.2000 | SI | 11.07.2000 | Title | German: | PRODRUGS VON ASPARTYL-PROTEASEINHIBITOREN | [2000/41] | English: | PRODRUGS OF ASPARTYL PROTEASE INHIBITORS | [2000/41] | French: | PRO-MEDICAMENTS QUI SONT DES INHIBITEURS DE L'ASPARTYL PROTEASE | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 17.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9405639 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1,13-22 * see tables I-IV; page 79, lines 7-16; claims 1-10, 16-24 *; | [A]WO9506030 (SEARLE & CO [US], et al) [A] 1,13-22 * see page 244, lines 26-38; claims *; | [AD]WO9633187 (VERTEX PHARMA [US]) [AD] 1,13-22 * see page 15, line 14 - page 16, line 2; table I; claims *; | [D]US5585397 (TUNG ROGER D [US]); | [A] - S. SAWADA ET AL, CURR. PHARM. DES., (1995), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 113 - 132, XP002104269 [A] 1,2 * see page 120, figure 7 * | [A] - J.M. BALKOVEC ET AL, J. MED. CHEM., (1992), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 194 - 198, XP002104270 [A] 1,2 * see page 195, table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00079a027 |