Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1038281
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.07.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] |
06.04.2001 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
27.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.10.2000 |
First examination report |
|
24.10.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.08.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.09.2000 [2000/39] |
11.08.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.09.2000 [2000/39] |
27.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|