EP1040145 - METHOD FOR GRAFTING LIGNIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/40] | METHOD FOR GRAFTING LIGNIN, POLYMERIZATES PRODUCED ACCORDING TO THE METHOD AND THE UTILIZATION THEREOF | ||
[2003/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STOCKHAUSEN GmbH & Co. KG Bäkerpfad 25 47805 Krefeld / DE | [2004/15] |
Former [2000/40] | For all designated states STOCKHAUSEN GmbH & CO. KG Bäkerpfad 25 47805 Krefeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÜTTERMANN, Aloys Henry-Dunant-Strasse 20 D-37075 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
MAI, Carsten Liebrechtstrasse 1 D-37075 Göttingen / DE | [2000/40] | Representative(s) | Harders, Gerhard Mantiusstrasse 4 23879 Mölln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/40] | Harders, Gerhard, Dr. Stettiner Strasse 2 61184 Karben / DE | Application number, filing date | 98965847.1 | 17.12.1998 | [2000/40] | WO1998EP08279 | Priority number, date | DE1997156172 | 17.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19756172 | [2000/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9931155 | Date: | 24.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1040145 | Date: | 04.10.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1040145 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08F289/00, C08H5/02, C12P7/22, C08F251/02 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
C08H6/00 (EP,US);
C08F289/00 (EP,US);
C08H1/06 (EP,US);
C08L51/08 (EP,US);
C08L97/02 (EP,US);
C09D11/03 (EP,US);
C09D7/20 (EP,US);
C09D7/43 (EP,US);
C09D7/45 (EP,US);
C09K3/22 (EP,US);
C09K8/206 (EP,US);
C11D3/3788 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L97/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2000/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PFROPFUNG VON LIGNIN | [2003/37] | English: | METHOD FOR GRAFTING LIGNIN | [2003/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE GREFFAGE DE LIGNINE | [2003/37] |
Former [2000/40] | VERFAHREN ZUR PFROPFUNG VON LIGNIN, DANACH HERGESTELLTE POLYMERISATE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2000/40] | METHOD FOR GRAFTING LIGNIN, POLYMERIZATES PRODUCED ACCORDING TO THE METHOD AND THE UTILIZATION THEREOF | ||
Former [2000/40] | PROCEDE DE GREFFAGE DE LIGNINE, POLYMERISATS OBTENUS A L'AIDE DUDIT PROCEDE ET LEUR UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/40] | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03025740.6 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 11.12.2003 | EP03028952.4 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 20.01.2004 | EP03029263.5 / EP1418189 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Request for further processing for: | 12.04.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 10.04.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.04.2003 | Decision despatched | 28.05.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.08.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.02.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 07.04.2004 | FR | 07.04.2004 | GB | 07.04.2004 | SE | 07.07.2004 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/02] | FI | 07.04.2004 | |
GB | 07.04.2004 | ||
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | GB | 07.04.2004 | |
SE | 07.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 07.07.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0072445 (BW MUD LTD [GB]) [Y] 8 * page 3, lines 26-33 *; | [Y]US4891415 (LIN STEPHEN Y [US], et al) [Y] 16,17,21 * siehe Spalte 1, Zeile 5-11 ; Spalte 1, Zeile 26-29 *; column 1, lines 34-46 *; | [DY]EP0442508 (MEISTER JOHN J [US]) [DY] 1-21* the whole document *; | [Y]US5116904 (MEISTER JOHN J, et al) [Y] 20 * column 1, lines 15-34 *; | [Y]WO9412620 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-21 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 26 *; | [Y]WO9501426 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [Y] 18,19 * abstract *; | [DXY]WO9508588 (HUETTERMANN ALOYS [DE], et al) [DX] 1-7,9-13,15 * siehe Seite 3, Zeile 13-28 ; Seite 1, Zeile 5 - Seite 3, Zeile 10 ; Ansprüche 1-8 *; page 4, line 19; example 1 * [Y] 8,16-21 |