EP0999848 - CHIMERIC PROTEINS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DIABETES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALEXION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 25 Science Park Suite 360 New Haven, CT 06511 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states ALEXION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 25 Science Park, Suite 360 New Haven, CT 06511 / US | ||
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states ALEXION PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 25 Science Park, Suite 360 New Haven, CT 06511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLER, John, P. 4 Butterwick Lane Old Lyme, CT 06371 / US | 02 /
MATIS, Louis, A. 775 Flintlock Road Southport, CT 06490 / US | 03 /
WANG, Yi 270 Sylvan Valley Road Orange, CT 06477 / US | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Maschio, Antonio, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Maschio, Antonio, et al D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98966066.7 | 23.12.1998 | [2000/20] | WO1998US27408 | Priority number, date | US19970068648P | 23.12.1997 Original published format: US 68648 P | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9932136 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0999848 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0999848 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.07.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, A61K38/28, A61K39/00, C07K14/00, C07K14/435, C07K14/62, C12N9/88 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
C07K14/62 (EP);
C12N9/88 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/20] | A61K38/16, A61K38/28, A61K39/00, C07K14/00, C07K14/435, C07K14/62 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/20] | Title | German: | CHIMÄRE PROTEINE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DIABETES | [2000/20] | English: | CHIMERIC PROTEINS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DIABETES | [2000/20] | French: | PROTEINES CHIMERES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU DIABETE | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 10.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 12.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.08.2006 | 14.07.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.02.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2000 | 14.02.2000 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2000 | 14.02.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2000 | 14.02.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2000 | 14.02.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2000 | 14.02.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2000 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 14.02.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   14.03.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0940470 (WALLAC OY) [E] 1,16,17 * page 2, line 55 - page 4, line 58 *; | [X]WO9626218 (AMRAD OPERATIONS) [X] 1,16,17 * page 2, line 20 - page 4, line 19 * * page 7, line 4 - page 9, line 9 *; | [AD]US4431740 (BELL GRAEME ET AL) [AD] 1,4,9-17 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4939094 ; | [AP]US5821334 ; | [X]US5691448 ; | [Y] - RAMIYA V K, ET AL., "IMMUNIZATION THERAPIES IN THE PREVENTION OF DIABETES", JOURNAL OF AUTOIMMUNITY, LONDON, GB, GB, (19970101), vol. 10, doi:10.1006/jaut.1997.0127, ISSN 0896-8411, pages 287 - 292, XP002918457 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jaut.1997.0127 |