blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0973431

EP0973431 - ENHANCING AND EXTRACTING SECOND ORDER NONLINEAR RESPONSE COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2011
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.04.2011  [2011/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sutter, Erich Erwin
711 Palomar Drive
Redwood City, CA 94062 / US
[2000/04]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Leinweber & Zimmermann
Patentanwalts-PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Viktualienmarkt 8
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
Former [2000/04]Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann
Rosental 7, II Aufgang
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date98966107.929.12.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998US27694
Priority number, dateUS1998000306005.01.1998         Original published format: US 3060
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9934727
Date:15.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973431
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973431
Date:12.05.2010
Language:EN
[2010/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.07.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2005
ClassificationIPC:A61B5/0496, A61B5/0484, A61B3/10, A61B3/032, A61B3/00
[2005/29]
CPC:
A61B3/032 (EP,US); A61B3/10 (EP,US); A61B5/398 (EP,US);
A61B5/378 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/04]A61B3/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/04]
TitleGerman:VERSTÄRKUNG UND ABTRENNUNG VON NICHT-LINEAREN SIGNALEN ZWEITER ORDNUNG EINER IMPULSANTWORT[2010/05]
English:ENHANCING AND EXTRACTING SECOND ORDER NONLINEAR RESPONSE COMPONENTS[2000/04]
French:REHAUSSEMENT ET EXTRACTION DE COMPOSANTES DE REPONSE NON LINEAIRES DE SECOND ORDRE[2000/04]
Former [2000/04]VERSTÄRKUNG UND ABTREENNUNG VON NICHT-LINEAREN SIGNALEN ZWEITER ORDNUNG EINER IMPULSANTWORT
Entry into regional phase04.10.1999National basic fee paid 
04.10.1999Search fee paid 
04.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
17.02.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.08.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2010Fee for grant paid
29.03.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
15.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
29.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
29.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
21.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
22.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
21.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DA]US5668577  (SUTTER ERICH E [US]) [DA] 1-9 * column 2, lines 17-34 * * column 8, line 56 - column 10, line 22 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [PX]WO9824364  (CINDATEC INGENIEURTECHNISCHE D [DE], et al) [PX] 1-9 * abstract * * page 4, line 17 - page 6, line 18 * * page 14, line 23 - page 15, line 33 *;
 [A]  - SPARKS S ET AL, "COMPARISON OF REPEATABILITY OF THE MULTIFOCAL ELECTRORETINOGRAM ANDHUMPHREY PERIMETER", DOCUMENTA OPHTHALMOLOGICA, KLUWER, DORDRECHT, NL, (1997), vol. 92, ISSN 0012-4486, pages 281 - 289, XP002062777 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BROWN B ET AL, "CONTRAST AND LUMINANCE AS PARAMETERS DEFINING THE OUTPUT OF THE VERIS TOPOGRAPHICAL ERG", OPHTHALMIC AND PHYSIOLOGICAL OPTICS, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (1996), vol. 16, no. 1, ISSN 0275-5408, pages 42 - 48, XP002062775 [A] 1-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0275-5408(95)00043-7
International search[A]US4846567  (SUTTER ERICH E [US]);
 [A]US4889422  (PAVLIDIS GEORGE [US]);
 [A]US5149317  (ROBINSON WILBUR A [US])
by applicantUS5667577
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.