EP1042059 - A METHOD FOR THE SUB-CRITICAL DRYING OF LYOGELS TO PRODUCE AEROGELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION Two Seaport Lane, Suite 1300 Boston, Massachusetts 02210-2019 / US | ||
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states CABOT CORPORATION 75 State Street Boston, MA 02109-1806 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTEL, Johannes Hasselstrasse 39 D-65812 Bad Soden / DE | 02 /
FORBERT, Rainald Harzweg 1 D-65439 Flörsheim / DE | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L. Patentanwälte Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 98966343.0 | 16.12.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998EP08244 | Priority number, date | DE1997156633 | 19.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19756633 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9932218 | Date: | 01.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042059 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1042059 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/00 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
F26B3/06 (EP,KR,US);
C01B33/1585 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERKRITISCHEN TROCKNUNG VONLYO-GELEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AEROGELEN | [2000/41] | English: | A METHOD FOR THE SUB-CRITICAL DRYING OF LYOGELS TO PRODUCE AEROGELS | [2000/41] | French: | PROCEDE DE SECHAGE SOUS-CRITIQUE DE LYOGELS POUR PRODUIRE DES AEROGELS | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9732662 (HOECHST AG [DE], et al) [A] * claims 1-11 * |