EP1035879 - METHOD FOR IMMOBILIZING MEDIATOR MOLECULE ON INORGANIC AND METAL IMPLANT MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Morphoplant GmbH Im Lottental 36 44801 Bochum / DE | [2003/30] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states EFMT Entwicklungs- und Forschungszentrum für Mikrotherapie gGmbH Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | ||
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states Jennissen, Herbert P. Von-der-Vogelweide-strasse 39 45279 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jennissen, Herbert P., Prof. Dr. Von-der-Vogelweide-Strasse 39 45279Essen / DE | [2001/19] |
Former [2000/38] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Essener Strasse 5 46047 Oberhausen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98966494.1 | 24.11.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998DE03463 | Priority number, date | DE19971052032 | 24.11.1997 Original published format: DE 19752032 | [2000/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9926674 | Date: | 03.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1035879 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1035879 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/28, A61L27/34, A61L31/08, A61L31/10 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
A61L27/28 (EP,US);
A61L27/30 (EP,US);
A61L27/34 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L31/08 (EP,US);
A61L31/082 (EP,US);
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61L27/34, A61L27/28, A61L27/06, A61L27/12, A61L27/227 (EP,US);
A61L31/10, A61L31/08, A61L31/047 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2000/38] | A61L27/00, A61L31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IMMOBILISIERUNG VON MEDIATORMOLEKÜLEN AUF ANORGANISCHEN UND METALLISCHEN IMPLANTATMATERIALIEN | [2000/38] | English: | METHOD FOR IMMOBILIZING MEDIATOR MOLECULE ON INORGANIC AND METAL IMPLANT MATERIAL | [2000/38] | French: | PROCEDE POUR IMMOBILISER DES MOLECULES MEDIATRICES SUR DES MATERIAUX D'IMPLANTS INORGANIQUES ET METALLIQUES | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 11.06.2003 | DK | 11.09.2003 | GR | 11.09.2003 | PT | 11.09.2003 | CY | 24.11.2003 | LU | 24.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | [2017/39] |
Former [2005/02] | IE | 11.06.2003 | |
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
CY | 24.11.2003 | ||
LU | 24.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | IE | 11.06.2003 | |
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
CY | 24.11.2003 | ||
LU | 24.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | IE | 11.06.2003 | |
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
CY | 24.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | IE | 11.06.2003 | |
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | IE | 11.06.2003 | |
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 11.09.2003 | |
PT | 11.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB387806 (ROBERT SECREST DUNHAM) [A] 9 * page 1, lines 87-104 - page 2, lines 14-23 *; | [A]GB593287 (CLEMENTS BATCHELLER) [A] 9 * page 2, lines 48-65 - lines 117-124 * * page 3, lines 25-30 *; | [A]WO9009798 (IMMUNOTHERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [A] 1,7,12-14 * abstract * * claims 1,2,5-7,14 *; | [A]WO9200047 (UNIV CASE WESTERN RESERVE [US]) [A] 1,2,4,7,11,14 * abstract * * page 1, lines 2-22 - page 3, lines 8,9 * * page 3, lines 1-28 - page 4, lines 6-9 * * page 4, lines 31-34 - page 5, lines 13-33 * * page 6, lines 1-18 *; | [A]US5330911 (HUBBELL JEFFREY A [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract ** column 1, lines 15-20 - lines 52-56 * |