Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1045830
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.02.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] |
07.03.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] |
30.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.11.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] |
13.11.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
04.04.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.02.2002 |
First examination report |
|
15.02.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.09.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] |
08.09.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] |
19.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2000 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.07.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.06.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|