EP1000215 - ELECTRONIC MODULE FOR A DRIVE UNIT POWERED BY AN ELECTRICAL MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Matthias Im Lindenbosch 51 D-76534 Baden-Baden / DE | 02 /
KNAB, Norbert Hauptstrasse 10a D-77767 Appenweier / DE | 03 /
HAUSSECKER, Walter Albert-Schneble-Strasse 25 D-77830 Bühlertal / DE | 04 /
VOEHRINGER, Klaus Berliner Strasse 10 D-76316 Malsch / DE | 05 /
RIEHL, Günther Längenbergweg 37 D-77830 Bühlertal / DE | 06 /
HAGER, Martin Holzmattweg 9a D-77830 Bühlertal / DE | 07 /
ROTH, Klaus Rue Charles de Coulomb 15 F-14125 Mondeville / FR | 08 /
BENZ, Jochen Hauptstrasse 136 D-89567 Sontheim / DE | [2000/20] | Application number, filing date | 98966781.1 | 17.12.1998 | [2000/20] | WO1998DE03719 | Priority number, date | DE1998104490 | 05.02.1998 Original published format: DE 19804490 | DE1998151455 | 09.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19851455 | [2000/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9940285 | Date: | 12.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000215 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000215 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/16, H02K23/66 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
B60R16/0239 (EP,US);
E05F15/697 (EP,US);
H02K11/38 (EP,US);
H02K23/66 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/55 (EP,US);
H02K2211/03 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/20] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONIKMODUL FÜR EINE ELEKTROMOTORISCH BETRIEBENE ANTRIEBSEINHEIT | [2000/20] | English: | ELECTRONIC MODULE FOR A DRIVE UNIT POWERED BY AN ELECTRICAL MOTOR | [2000/20] | French: | MODULE ELECTRONIQUE POUR UNITE D'ENTRAINEMENT COMMANDEE PAR UN MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 23.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0538495 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,16,17 * column 2, line 40 - line 43 * [A] 2,3,11; | [AD]DE19746518 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1-3,19 * column 2, line 5 - line 41 *; | [A]US5528093 (ADAM PETER [DE], et al) [A] 2,3,8,19 * column 3, line 13 - line 20; figure 1C *; | [A]DE4225496 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [A] 1,16,17 * column 3, line 16 - line 64 * |