EP1062878 - MIXED CRYSTALS COMPRISING ASPARTAME AND ASPARTAME DERIVATIVE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | [2008/07] |
Former [2000/52] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISHISHITA, Akihirai, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-0801 / JP | 02 /
NAGASHIMA, Kazutaka, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-0801 / JP | [2000/52] | Representative(s) | Benedum, Ulrich Max, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstrasse 3 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Benedum, Ulrich Max, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Theatinerstrasse 3 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Benedum, Ulrich Max, et al Haseltine Lake Partners Theatinerstrasse 3 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Benedum, Ulrich Max, et al Haseltine Lake Partners Theatinerstrasse 3 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/52] | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98967073.2 | 07.12.1998 | [2000/52] | WO1998JP05532 | Priority number, date | JP19970344777 | 15.12.1997 Original published format: JP 34477797 | [2000/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9930574 | Date: | 24.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1062878 | Date: | 27.12.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1062878 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.06.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/236, A23L1/22, C07K5/06, C07C229/00, C07C229/36, A23G3/00 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
C07K5/06113 (EP,US);
A23L27/30 (KR);
A23L27/32 (EP,US);
C07K5/0613 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/52] | A23L1/236 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/52] | Title | German: | MISCHKRISTALLE ENTHALTEND ASPARTAM UND ASPARTAMDERIVATE SOWIE EIN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERSELBEN | [2000/52] | English: | MIXED CRYSTALS COMPRISING ASPARTAME AND ASPARTAME DERIVATIVE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2000/52] | French: | CRISTAUX MELANGES COMPRENANT DE L'ASPARTAME ET UN DERIVE DE L'ASPARTAME, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIE | [2000/52] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2000 | Translation filed | 05.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 05.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 18.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0362706 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [Y] 1,7 * page 2, line 39 - line 39 *; | [YP]US5728862 (PRAKASH INDRA [US]) [YP] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [XPY]JPH10248520 ; | [Y]US5473097 (KISHIMOTO SHINICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 3-7 * claims 1-11,30 *; | [E]EP0974272 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [E] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5041607 (NARUSE MASAYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,7 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 4; example - *; | [Y]US5510508 (CLAUDE NOFRE [FR], et al) [Y] 1,7 * claims 1,8 *; | [A]US4579747 (SUGIYAMA KATSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0680971 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0458750 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [A] * claims 1-5 *; | [A]JPH03204895 ; | [A]EP0759030 (NOFRE CLAUDE [FR], et al) | [XPY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981231), vol. 1998, no. 14, & JP10248520 A 19980922 (AJINOMOTO CO INC) [XP] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 3-7 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1991, no. 42, Database accession no. 1991-306732, XP002307835 & JPH03204895 A 19910906 (AJINOMOTO KK) [A] * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH08503206 |