EP1044074 - PHOTORESIST COATING PROCESS CONTROL WITH SOLVENT VAPOR SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/42] | PHOTORESIST COATING PROCESS CONTROL WITH SOLENT VAPOR SENSOR | ||
[2007/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Holding N.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states ASML Holding N.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states ASML Holding N.V. De Run 1110 5503 LA Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states ASML US, Inc. 8555 South River Parkway Tempe AZ 85284 / US | ||
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states Silicon Valley Group, Inc. 2240 Ringwood Avenue San Jose, CA 95110 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gurer, Emir 709 Coast Range Drive Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US | 02 /
Litvak, Herbert 790 Lodgewood Court San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 03 /
Savage, Richard 5 Fox Sparrow Court Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | McGowan, Cathrine D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | McGowan, Cathrine D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [2000/42] | Potter, Julian Mark, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98967092.2 | 08.12.1998 | [2000/42] | WO1998US26143 | Priority number, date | US19970987179 | 08.12.1997 Original published format: US 987179 | [2000/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9929439 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1044074 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1044074 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1044074 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.06.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B05D3/12, B05D3/02, B05D3/10, H01L21/469, B05C11/00, B05C11/02, C23C16/00 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
B05D1/005 (EP,KR,US);
B05C11/08 (EP,KR,US);
B05D3/0486 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/162 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHRENSREGELUNG FÜR PHOTORESISTENTE BESCHICHTUNG MIT SOLVENTDAMPFSENSOR | [2007/25] | English: | PHOTORESIST COATING PROCESS CONTROL WITH SOLVENT VAPOR SENSOR | [2007/25] | French: | COMMANDE DE PROCESSUS D'APPLICATION DE PHOTORESIST A DETECTEUR DE VAPEUR DE SOLVANT | [2000/42] |
Former [2000/42] | VERFAHRENSREGELUNG FÜR PHOTORESISTENTE BESCHICHTUNG MITSOLVENTDAMPFSENSOR | ||
Former [2000/42] | PHOTORESIST COATING PROCESS CONTROL WITH SOLENT VAPOR SENSOR | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 03.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.07.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 22.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07007848.0 / EP1847328 | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.06.2007 | BE | 20.06.2007 | CH | 20.06.2007 | CY | 20.06.2007 | DK | 20.06.2007 | FI | 20.06.2007 | LI | 20.06.2007 | SE | 20.09.2007 | GR | 21.09.2007 | ES | 01.10.2007 | PT | 20.11.2007 | LU | 08.12.2007 | IE | 10.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2009/15] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
FI | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
IE | 10.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
DK | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
GR | 21.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 20.06.2007 | |
BE | 20.06.2007 | ||
CH | 20.06.2007 | ||
LI | 20.06.2007 | ||
SE | 20.09.2007 | ||
ES | 01.10.2007 | ||
PT | 20.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5095848 (IKENO MASAHIKO [JP]) [A] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2277892 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [A] 1,16* the whole document *; | [A]US5571560 (LIN BURN J [US]) [A] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [A]US5670210 (MANDAL ROBERT P [US], et al) [A] 1,16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0810478 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 1,16 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5417100 (MILLER LEROY J [US], et al); | [A]US5670210 (MANDAL ROBERT P [US], et al) |