EP1007027 - SYNTHETICALLY PREPARED COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT AND/OR PROPHYLAXIS OF OVERWEIGHT, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2001 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pemby Ltd 8 Queensway House, Queen Street St. Helier Jersey JE2 4WD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states Pemby Ltd 8 Queensway House, Queen Street St. Helier, Jersey JE2 4WD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOM, Erling Stasjonsvn. 5 A N-0387 Oslo / NO | 02 /
KJELDSTADLI, Jarl Ths. Heftyesgt. 37 N-0264 Oslo / NO | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Lindberg, Klas Valter Bo, et al AWAPATENT AB, Södra Hamngatan 37-41, P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Lindberg, Klas Valter Bo, et al AWAPATENT AB, Södra Hamngatan 37-41, P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 98967120.1 | 14.12.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998NO00379 | Priority number, date | NO19980002818 | 18.06.1998 Original published format: NO 982818 | [2000/24] | Filing language | NO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0000188 | Date: | 06.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1007027 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/19 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
A61K31/194 (EP);
C07C59/245 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Extension states | AL | 15.03.2000 | LT | 15.03.2000 | LV | 15.03.2000 | RO | 15.03.2000 | SI | 15.03.2000 | Title | German: | SYNTHETISCH VORBEREITETE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND/ODER VORBEUGUNG DES ÜBERGEURICHTS UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2000/24] | English: | SYNTHETICALLY PREPARED COMPOSITION FOR TREATMENT AND/OR PROPHYLAXIS OF OVERWEIGHT, AND USE THEREOF | [2000/24] | French: | COMPOSITION DE SYNTHESE ET UTILISATION POUR LE TRAITENMENT ET LA PREVENTION DE L'OBESITE | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2000 | Translation filed | 15.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 03.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/02] | 08.08.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9636585 ; | [A]WO9605741 ; | [A]US3993667 ; | [A]US4005086 ; | [A] - SINGH R P, JAYAPRAKASHA G K, SAKARIAH K K, "(-)-Hydroxycitric Acid from Garcinia Cambogia", STN CAPLUS, (19000101), Database accession no. 1996:43524, XP002921043 |