EP0928801 - Reactive diluents for polyamidoamine epoxy curatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2000 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIR PRODUCTS AND CHEMICALS, INC. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [1999/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Starner, William Edward 47 White Oak Road Nesquehoning, PA 18240 / US | 02 /
Myers, Richard Scott 89 Wiltrout Road Kutztown, PA 19530 / US | 03 /
Smith, Andrea Karen 804 Eagle Drive Emmaus, PA 18049 / US | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100083.7 | 05.01.1999 | [1999/28] | Priority number, date | US19980003492 | 06.01.1998 Original published format: US 3492 | [1999/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0928801 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0928801 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/02, C08L63/00 | [1999/28] | CPC: |
C08G73/0213 (EP,US);
C08G59/54 (EP,US);
C08G73/02 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L77/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reaktivverdünner für Polyamidoamine Epoxidharzhärter | [1999/28] | English: | Reactive diluents for polyamidoamine epoxy curatives | [1999/28] | French: | Diluants réactifs pour polyamidoamines durcisseurs de résines époxydes | [1999/28] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 23.10.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5567748 (KLEIN DIETER H [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 11, line 31 - line 59; claim 1 *; | [AD]BE663324 (BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [AD] 1-10 * page 4, lines 1,2; claim 1 * |