EP0929013 - Anti-wrinkle baffle before fusing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/28] | Anti-wrinkle fuser baffle | ||
[2005/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2006 [2006/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quesnel, Lisbeth S. 27 Widewaters Lane Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | 02 /
Van Bortel, David P. 4124 County Line Road Macedon, New York 14502 / US | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100187.6 | 07.01.1999 | [1999/28] | Priority number, date | US19980004461 | 08.01.1998 Original published format: US 4461 | [1999/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0929013 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0929013 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/20 | [1999/28] | CPC: |
G03G15/2028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/12] |
Former [1999/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Führung zur Beseitigung von Wellen vor Schmelzfixiervorrichtung | [2005/05] | English: | Anti-wrinkle baffle before fusing device | [2005/05] | French: | Guide anti-gondolement en avant d'une unité de fixage par fusion | [2005/05] |
Former [1999/28] | Wellungswegnehmende Führung für Schmezfixiervorrichtung | ||
Former [1999/28] | Anti-wrinkle fuser baffle | ||
Former [1999/28] | Guide anti gondolement pour unité de fixage par fusion | Examination procedure | 14.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 01.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 07.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6050568 ; | [XA]US4843214 (HIGASHI YUITIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 24; figures 4,5 * [A] 6-9; | [A]JPS6167068 ; | [A]US5515151 (VELAZQUEZ CARLOS A [US]) [A] 1,3,4,6,8,9 * column A; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4876576 (ITAYA KEIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,4,6,8,9 * column A; figures 2,3,8 *; | [A]US5519477 (BELL CONRAD J [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6,9 * column A; figure 3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850723), vol. 009, no. 177, Database accession no. (P - 375), & JP60050568 A 19850320 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860812), vol. 010, no. 232, Database accession no. (P - 486), & JP61067068 A 19860407 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND CO LTD) [A] 1-4,6-9 * abstract * |