EP0928763 - Method for sheet registration using a single sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/28] | Apparatus and method for sheet registration using a single sensor | ||
[2004/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A Rochester, NY 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castelli, Vittorio R. 257 Somerston Road Yorktown Heights, NY 10598 / US | 02 /
Polatkan, Osman T. 281 North Haledon Avenue North Haledon, NJ 07508 / US | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100204.9 | 07.01.1999 | [1999/28] | Priority number, date | US19980004293 | 08.01.1998 Original published format: US 4293 | [1999/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0928763 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0928763 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0928763 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65H9/10, B65H7/06 | [1999/28] | CPC: |
B65H9/002 (EP,US);
B41J11/0055 (EP,US);
B41J13/26 (EP,US);
G03G15/6564 (EP,US);
G03G15/6567 (EP,US);
B65H2511/24 (EP,US);
B65H2601/121 (EP,US);
G03G15/235 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00561 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00721 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/24, B65H2220/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/35] |
Former [1999/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ausrichten von Bogen unter Einsatz eines einzigen Sensors | [2004/37] | English: | Method for sheet registration using a single sensor | [2004/37] | French: | Procédé pour aligner des feuilles utilisant un seul capteur | [2004/37] |
Former [1999/28] | Apparat und Verfahren zum Ausrichten von Bogen unter Einsatz eines einzigen Sensors | ||
Former [1999/28] | Apparatus and method for sheet registration using a single sensor | ||
Former [1999/28] | Appareil et procédé pour aligner des feuilles utilisant un seul capteur | Examination procedure | 04.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 24.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07257799 ; | [A]US4641272 (SASAKI TOMIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,7 * column 1, line 44 - line 50 * * column 3, line 26 - line 45 * * figure 2 *; | [DY]US5678159 (WILLIAMS LLOYD A [US], et al) [DY] 2-6,8 * column 8, line 8 - line 10 * * column 8, line 11 - line 18 * * column 10, line 13 - line 24 * * figure 2 *; | [XY]EP0814040 (BOURG C P SA [BE]) [X] 1,7 * column 3, line 10 - line 24 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 27 * * figures 2,3A-4B * [Y] 2-6,8; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1995, no. 50, Database accession no. 1995-385621, XP002215917 & JPH07257799 A 19951009 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |