EP0928916 - Insert for flow throttling ball valves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GRISWOLD CONTROLS, INC. 2803 Barranca Parkway Irvine, CA 92714 / US | [1999/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marandi, Ali 4482 Elm Tree Lane Irvine, California 92612 / US | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100279.1 | 08.01.1999 | [1999/28] | Priority number, date | US19980004946 | 09.01.1998 Original published format: US 4946 | [1999/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0928916 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0928916 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | [2000/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16K5/06, F16K5/12 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
F16K5/0605 (EP,US);
F16K5/10 (US);
F16K5/12 (EP);
Y10T137/5283 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/28] | F16K5/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/28] | Title | German: | Einsatz für einen Strömungsdrosselkugelhahn | [1999/28] | English: | Insert for flow throttling ball valves | [1999/28] | French: | Insertion pour un robinet d'étranglement de débit à tounant sphérique | [1999/28] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 24.10.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4172584 (LEGRIS ANDRE [FR]) [A] 1-3,5,6,11,12,16,17,27 * column 4, line 18 - line 49 * * column 5, line 15 - line 43 * * column 6, line 52 - line 55 ** figures 1,2,8,16 *; | [XA]DE4115101 (TOTAL FEUERSCHUTZ GMBH [DE]) [X] 9,13,15,17,25,26 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 46 * * figures 1,4-11; claim 9 * [A] 1,18,19,24 | by applicant | US5593135 |