Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.11.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] |
05.02.2002 | Renewal fee | |
22.11.2001 | Change - extension states | |
20.07.2001 | Definitive list of designations | published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] |
06.07.2001 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] |
18.01.2001 | Renewal fee | |
03.11.2000 | Publication of search report | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
03.11.2000 | Change - classification | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
03.11.2000 | Change - classification | published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
28.05.1999 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.07.1999 [1999/28] |