Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH11270711 | Global Dossier | 05.10.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US494698 | 09.01.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0928916 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2000 | A3 | EP0928916 | 14.07.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US494698 | 09.01.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5937890 | 17.08.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US494698 | 09.01.1998 |