EP0930682 - Method and device for removing the outer layer of a cable end [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HA Kabeltechnik, A. Haderlapp Neumarkter Strasse 83 81673 München / DE | [1999/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haderlapp, Alfred Schwarzenbacher Strasse 5 81549 München / DE | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Paustian, Othmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Patentanwälte Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Paustian, Othmar, Dr.-Ing, et al c/o Lieck & Partner, Widenmayerstrasse 36 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100359.1 | 15.01.1999 | [1999/29] | Priority number, date | DE1998101538 | 16.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19801538 | [1999/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0930682 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0930682 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02G1/12 | [1999/29] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, SE [2000/13] |
Former [1999/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entfernen des Aussenmantels vom Endbereich eines Kabels | [1999/29] | English: | Method and device for removing the outer layer of a cable end | [1999/29] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour enlever la gaine extérieure de l'extrémité d'un câble | [1999/29] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 22.01.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, MC, NL, PT | 07.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.02.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 24.04.2002 | LU | 15.01.2003 | SE | 16.01.2003 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/41] | GB | 24.04.2002 | |
SE | 16.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/17] | GB | 24.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [AX]US3959877 (ZORZENON PETER) [A] 1,8,9 * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 33; figures 1,2 * [X] 3,4,6,7; | [A]US4142290 (DUCRET LUCIEN C) [A] 1,3* column 1, line 24 - column 51 * |