EP0930270 - Production of alumina [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.08.2007 [2007/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Water Treatments Limited P.O. Box 38, Low Moor Bradford West Yorks. BD12 0JZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Water Treatments Limited P.O. Box 38, Low Moor Bradford, West Yorks. BD12 0JZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Welton, Roger 12 West Street, Leven Beverley, North Humberside HU17 5LF / GB | 02 /
McColl, Philip 239 Meltham Road Netherton, Huddersfield, HD4 7HL / GB | [1999/29] | Application number, filing date | 99100462.3 | 11.01.1999 | [1999/29] | Priority number, date | GB19980000855 | 15.01.1998 Original published format: GB 9800855 | [1999/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0930270 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0930270 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C01F7/14, B01D9/00 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
C01F7/145 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GR, IE, IT [2000/13] |
Former [1999/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellung von Aluminiumoxid | [1999/29] | English: | Production of alumina | [1999/29] | French: | Production d'alumine | [1999/29] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 28.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.01.2005 | [2007/34] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4737352 (OWEN DAVID O [US], et al); | [A]EP0327660 (VAW VER ALUMINIUM WERKE AG [DE]); | [X]WO9210426 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,7,9-21 * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 6, column 1; claim - *; | [X]US5167831 (DIMAS PETER A [US]) [X] 1,2,7,9-21 * column W *; | [A]US5346511 (DIMAS PETER A [US], et al); | [DA]EP0631985 (ALLIED COLLOIDS LTD [GB]) |