Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59913569D1 | 03.08.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE59913569 | 12.01.1999 | DE19808021 | 26.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0938988 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2006 | B1 | EP0938988 | 28.05.2003 | A3 | EP0938988 | 01.09.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19808021 | 26.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19808021 | 26.07.2001 | C2 | DE19808021 | 09.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19808021 | 26.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2262258T | 16.11.2006 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19808021 | 26.02.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6199845 | 13.03.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19808021 | 26.02.1998 |