EP0928845 - Device for directly or indirectly applying a liquid or a pasty product onto a moving web, especially paper or board [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2000/51] |
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hess, Harald Am Ottersberg 20 88287 Grünkraut / DE | 02 /
Kurtz, Rüdiger Dr. Backnanger Weg 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | 03 /
Mendéz-Gallon, Benjamin Dr. Griessaeckerstrasse 16 89551 Itzelberg (Königsbronn) / DE | [1999/28] | Representative(s) | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/28] | Herzog, Markus, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Weickmann und Partner, Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100508.3 | 12.01.1999 | [1999/28] | Priority number, date | DE1998100954 | 13.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19800954 | [1999/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0928845 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0928845 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | [2000/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | D21H25/00 | [1999/28] | CPC: |
D21H25/06 (EP,US);
Y10S118/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FI, FR, IT, SE [2000/52] |
Former [1999/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum direkten oder indirekten Auftragen eines flüssigen oder pastösen Auftragsmediums auf eine laufende Materialbahn, insbesondere aus Papier oder Karton | [1999/28] | English: | Device for directly or indirectly applying a liquid or a pasty product onto a moving web, especially paper or board | [1999/28] | French: | Dispositif pour appliquer un liquide ou un produit pâteux sur une bande en mouvement, particulièrement de papier ou de carton | [1999/28] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 19.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/01] | 03.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3152918 (KRAUS JAMES J) [X] 1,18 * column 3, lines 5-72; figures 1-3 * [Y] 1,18; | [X]EP0617167 (VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI]) [X] 1,18 * column 3, line 37 - column 5, line 8 *; | [X]DE1817912 (VEPA AG [CH]) [X] 1,18 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]DE3935059 (RÜMMER J) [X] 1,18 * column 7, paragraph 1; figure 8; claim 28 *; | [X]US5454870 (SIEBERTH RALF [US]) [X] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-16 *; | [Y]EP0643168 (VOITH GMBH J M [DE]) [Y] 1,18 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 56; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5536535 (YAMAZAKI YOICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,18 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 31 *; | [A]DE3701406 (VIB APPARATEBAU GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,18 * claims 1-12 *; | [A]DE2545901 (INVENTING AB) [A] 17,34-36,40-42 * figures 1-7; claims 1-35 *; | [A]DE19545182 (NEW OJI PAPER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,18 |