EP0930437 - Thread tapping screw [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOGE-Dübel A. Gerhard KG Illesheimer Strasse 10 90431 Nürnberg / DE | [1999/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerhard, Anton Iphofener Strasse 21 90427 Nürnberg / DE | [1999/29] | Representative(s) | Rau, Manfred, et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/29] | Rau, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Ing., et al Rau, Schneck & Hübner Patentanwälte Königstrasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100521.6 | 13.01.1999 | [1999/29] | Priority number, date | DE1998101100 | 15.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19801100 | [1999/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0930437 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0930437 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F16B25/00, F16B25/10 | [1999/29] | CPC: |
F16B25/0073 (EP);
F16B25/00 (EP);
F16B25/0026 (EP);
F16B25/0047 (EP);
F16B25/0052 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/13] |
Former [1999/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gewindeschneidende Schraube | [1999/29] | English: | Thread tapping screw | [1999/29] | French: | Vis autotaraudante | [1999/29] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/02] | 22.01.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.05.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 01.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.02.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2003/21] | FR | 25.01.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8103990U (JAEGER EBERHARDT GMBH) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0589398 (SCHRIEVER HANS GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,2* figure 1 *; | [A]EP0623759 (HETTICH LUDWIG SCHRAUBENFAB [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 3, lines 17-20; figure 2; claim 2 *; | [AD]DE29704226U (TOGE DUEBEL A GERHARD KG [DE]) [AD] 1,2 * the whole document * |