EP0935984 - Mounting device for a wheel on an inline skate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2004 [2004/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salomon S.A. Lieudit La Ravoire 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | [1999/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baron, Pascal 14, rue George Sand 74600 Seynod / FR | 02 /
Bosse, Ivan 10 Route de Vignières 74000 Annecy / FR | [1999/33] | Application number, filing date | 99100761.8 | 16.01.1999 | [1999/33] | Priority number, date | FR19980001931 | 13.02.1998 Original published format: FR 9801931 | [1999/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0935984 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A63C17/06 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
A63C17/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, IT, LI, NL [2000/17] |
Former [1999/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Befestigen von Rollen an einem einspurigen Rollschuh | [1999/33] | English: | Mounting device for a wheel on an inline skate | [1999/33] | French: | Dispositif d'assemblage d'une roue sur un patin en ligne | [1999/33] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 01.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/09] | 09.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0503877 (ROLLERBLADE INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 9, line 18 - line 20; figures 2-4,8,9 *; | [A]DE29605620U (EJOT KUNSTSTOFFTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE19710297 (TEXTRON INC [US]) [DA] 1 * figures 14,15 *; | [A]US5356209 (HILL MARTIN H [US]) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [A]EP0043250 (MURRY LIONEL LOUIS) [A] * figures 9-11 * | by applicant | US5190301 | US5362075 | US5388846 | US5454676 |