Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19828949 | 22.07.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19828949 | 29.06.1998 | DE19801868 | 20.01.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19901103 | 22.07.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19801868 | 20.01.1998 | DE19901103 | 14.01.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0930103 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2003 | A3 | EP0930103 | 21.07.1999 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE19801868 | 20.01.1998 |