EP0914011 - Display module alignment device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-Dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do 441-370 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-Dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do 441-370 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mazurek, Niel 973 Thrush Lane Huntingdon Valley, PA 19006 / US | 02 /
Zammit, Theodore J. 1301 Seneca Run Ambler, PA 19002 / US | 03 /
Maloney, Thomas C. 201 Field Club Ridge Road Pittsburgh, PA 15238 / US | [1999/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100817.8 | 11.05.1995 | [1999/18] | Priority number, date | US19940241599 | 12.05.1994 Original published format: US 241599 | [1999/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0914011 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0914011 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/12, G09F9/35 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
H04N9/12 (EP,US);
G02F1/13336 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/133514 (KR);
G06F3/147 (EP,US);
G09F9/35 (EP,US);
H04N5/70 (EP,US);
H04N5/7441 (EP,US);
H04N9/30 (EP,US);
H10K59/18 (KR);
G09G2300/026 (EP,US);
G09G2360/04 (EP,US);
Y10S248/919 (EP,US);
Y10S345/903 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Ausrichten von Anzeigemodulen | [2002/09] | English: | Display module alignment device | [1999/18] | French: | Dispositif d'alignement de modules d'affichage | [1999/18] |
Former [1999/18] | Vorrichtung zum Ausrichten von Anzeigemoduln | Examination procedure | 02.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 05.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95918207.2 / EP0709014 | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4791417 (BOBAK TADEUSZ [US]); | [DA]US4832457 (SAITOH MASAKATSU [JP], et al); | [A]WO9316578 (VILNES DAG [NO]); | [A]EP0557161 (THOMSON TUBES ELECTRONIQUES [FR]) |