EP0933432 - Apparatus for fleshing hides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zäpfel, Horst Hermann-Löns-Weg 9 76228 Karlsruhe / DE | For all designated states Gabelmann, Erich Hochstrasse 6 78166 Donaueschingen / DE | [1999/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/31] | Representative(s) | Lichti - Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/31] | Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti Dipl.-Phys. Dr.rer.nat. Jost Lempert Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 99100864.0 | 19.01.1999 | [1999/31] | Priority number, date | DE1998103393 | 29.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19803393 | [1999/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0933432 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0933432 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0933432 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C14B1/04 | [1999/31] | CPC: |
C14B1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2001/10] |
Former [2001/04] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entfleischen von Häuten | [1999/31] | English: | Apparatus for fleshing hides | [1999/31] | French: | Dispositif pour l'écharnage des peaux | [1999/31] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/10] | 18.11.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 13.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.02.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.02.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB240472 (ALEXANDER KEHRHAHN) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE2756758 (MERCIER GEORGES) [A] 1 * page 10, line 28 - page 11, line 1; figures 5,6 * |